TN SB0307 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 283
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 283
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes wild hog from definition of "big game" and removes permitting requirements for hunting wild boars and wild hogs. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Title
As enacted, deletes wild hog from definition of "big game" and removes permitting requirements for hunting wild boars and wild hogs. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - S. E&E COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - S. E,C&T COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - S. E&E COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - S. E,C&T COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 283 | |
2011-06-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-05-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-18 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-17 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-16 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-16 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-04-14 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-04-11 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-04-11 | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/11/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on S. E,C&T Comm. cal. for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0947 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 283