TN SB0306 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the penalty for using an unmanned aircraft over a critical infrastructure facility without the business operator's consent from a Class C misdemeanor to a Class E felony; adds communication service facilities to the types of facilities that are considered critical infrastructure facilities. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, increases the penalty for using an unmanned aircraft over a critical infrastructure facility without the business operator's consent from a Class C misdemeanor to a Class E felony; adds communication service facilities to the types of facilities that are considered critical infrastructure facilities. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 60 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 2 |
2019-03-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0052) |
2019-03-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0018) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0308 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 60