TN SB0304 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits misrepresenting a product as meat or poultry that is not removed from the carcass of slaughtered livestock or poultry. - Amends TCA Title 44; Title 53 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, prohibits misrepresenting a product as meat or poultry that is not removed from the carcass of slaughtered livestock or poultry. - Amends TCA Title 44; Title 53 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1178 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee