TN SB0302 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes subject to public disclosure certain records, documents, and information pertaining to payers of the business tax, as long as the taxpayer consents to the public disclosure. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5 and Title 67, relative to records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 327 | |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0560 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021