TN SB0299 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, defines "food hall" for purposes of consumption of alcohol on the premises of a food hall. - Amends TCA Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to food halls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021
2021-04-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021
2021-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-03-24SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
2021-03-23SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0674 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback