TN SB0298 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the University of Tennessee College of Medicine and the East Tennessee State University Quillen College of Medicine, in cooperation with the department of health and THEC, to administer certain residency opportunities; creates a resident training program to provide resident training opportunities for physicians focusing on family medicine and general internal medicine to provide medical and behavioral health services in medically underserved areas and rural counties, distributed across all three grand divisions of this state. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 33; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7; Title 33; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to medical education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02 Pub. Ch. 587
2021-06-02 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0467)
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0462)
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0461)
2021-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0124)
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-05-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-05-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-05-04SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0084)
2021-05-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0448)
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
2021-03-08SenateRefer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2021-03-08SenateRecalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0443 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 587

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback