TN SB0297 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, corrects error in code to clarify that a petitioner is required to pay $180 upon filing a petition for expunction, rather than $350; revises fee to be $180 instead of $350 for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, corrects error in code to clarify that a petitioner is required to pay $180 upon filing a petition for expunction, rather than $350; revises fee to be $180 instead of $350 for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-02SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0903 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback