TN SB0294 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends real property tax reimbursement for disabled veterans to prior tax years covered during the pendency of an appeal to the United States department of veterans affairs for a determination that the veteran has acquired a service-connected permanent and total disability. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7, relative to disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0198 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee