TN SB0294 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes employee title from assistant executive director to deputy executive director; allows attorneys in the office of executive director a reasonable length of time to conclude or transfer private legal matters pending at the time of employment. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, changes employee title from assistant executive director to deputy executive director; allows attorneys in the office of executive director a reasonable length of time to conclude or transfer private legal matters pending at the time of employment. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 302 | |
2019-05-13 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1288 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 302