TN SB0293 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows a representative of the sheriff and county mayor to serve on the governing body of an emergency communications district instead of the present requirement that the sheriff and county mayor serve on the governing body. - Amends TCA Section 7-86-105.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, allows a representative of the sheriff and county mayor to serve on the governing body of an emergency communications district instead of the present requirement that the sheriff and county mayor serve on the governing body. - Amends TCA Section 7-86-105.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-28SenateComp. became Pub. Ch. 34
2013-03-07SenateComp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2013-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/7/2013
2013-03-05SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-02-27SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013
2013-02-26SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2013
2013-02-20SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013
2013-02-19SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/26/2013
2013-02-13SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-29SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0076 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-28 - Pub. Ch. 34

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback