TN SB0284 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 386
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 386
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a process for reimbursing physicians for services rendered during the pendency of a credentialing application before a health insurance entity. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As enacted, establishes a process for reimbursing physicians for services rendered during the pendency of a credentialing application before a health insurance entity. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 386 | |
2015-05-18 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2016 | |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0440) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0440) |
2015-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0381) |
2015-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0251) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0440 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 386