TN SB0282 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes provisions related to a report regarding the status of the development of a plan for a statewide system of care for children's mental health due by February 1, 2009, and plans regarding implementation of the system of children's mental health care statewide due by July 1, 2010, and July 1, 2012, all of which were submitted by the council on children's mental health care to the governor, the judiciary, education, and health and welfare committees of the senate and the civil justice, education, and health committees of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 37, relative to children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to first calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0330 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee