TN SB0281 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Chronic Disease Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 39; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Chronic Disease Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 39; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-09SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-08SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0191)
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
2019-04-03SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-28SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 4-3-19
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0774 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback