TN SB0279 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes the requirement that the nonprofit partner of the governor's office of faith-based and community initiatives use its own revenues to cover the cost of the nonprofit partner's activities; removes the prohibition on a state employee benefitting from the nonprofit partner's activities; prohibits a state employee from receiving compensation from funds received by the nonprofit partner; removes the statement of the general assembly's intent that the state not realize any increased cost as a result of such office. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 32.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 32, relative to the financial activities of the governor's office of faith-based and community initiatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18 Effective date(s) 04/13/2023
2023-04-18 Pub. Ch. 146
2023-04-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-04-05SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-03SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-30HousePassed H., Ayes 72, Nays 16, PNV 1
2023-03-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0211)
2023-03-30HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-03-27HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-03-23SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-03-23SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4
2023-03-23SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0210)
2023-03-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023
2023-03-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
2023-03-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-03-07SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2023
2023-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2023
2023-01-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0327 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 146

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback