TN SB0279 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that industrial hemp and products derived from industrial hemp, other than isolated THC, are not subject to scheduling as a controlled substance and are not subject to forfeiture based solely on their composition; applies that specification to hemp and hemp-derived products if the state obtains primacy to regulate hemp production under the 2018 Farm Bill; prohibits police searches based solely on the odor of cannabis. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53 and Section 67-4-2802.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies that industrial hemp and products derived from industrial hemp, other than isolated THC, are not subject to scheduling as a controlled substance and are not subject to forfeiture based solely on their composition; applies that specification to hemp and hemp-derived products if the state obtains primacy to regulate hemp production under the 2018 Farm Bill; prohibits police searches based solely on the odor of cannabis. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53 and Section 67-4-2802.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0274 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback