TN SB0270 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, includes preschool programs operated by an LEA for children with disabilities in the programs subject to annual appropriations; directs the commissioner to annually recommend a funding amount per classroom for preschool programs for children with disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 10; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, includes preschool programs operated by an LEA for children with disabilities in the programs subject to annual appropriations; directs the commissioner to annually recommend a funding amount per classroom for preschool programs for children with disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 10; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0210 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee