TN SB0265 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class C misdemeanor the offense of possession of a small amount of marijuana not in excess of one-eighth ounce; punishes the offense by imposing a fine of no more than $50. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, reduces from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class C misdemeanor the offense of possession of a small amount of marijuana not in excess of one-eighth ounce; punishes the offense by imposing a fine of no more than $50. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0297 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee