TN SB0264 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises offense regarding destruction or interference with utility lines, fixtures or appliances, or property utilized by railroads to apply to certain activities involving critical infrastructure. - Amends TCA Section 39-14-411.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises offense regarding destruction or interference with utility lines, fixtures or appliances, or property utilized by railroads to apply to certain activities involving critical infrastructure. - Amends TCA Section 39-14-411.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 370
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-05-10SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-01SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-30HousePassed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-30HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0136)
2019-04-30HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-21HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-19SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-18SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-03-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0098)
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-12SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0156 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 370

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback