TN SB0259 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires local education agencies to develop and implement a "Stop the Bleed" program that requires each school in the LEA to place a bleeding control kit within the school; requires the department of education to develop a bleeding control kit training program for LEA employees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires local education agencies to develop and implement a "Stop the Bleed" program that requires each school in the LEA to place a bleeding control kit within the school; requires the department of education to develop a bleeding control kit training program for LEA employees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-17SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 1
2019-04-17SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0081)
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/6/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0215 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback