TN SB0256 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commission to include information concerning in-state and out-of-state tuition rates charged by public higher education institutions in the eight states bordering Tennessee to aid in assessing tuition affordability. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 58; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 58; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9, relative to tuition.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateWithdrawn.
2021-02-25SenateRecalled from Senate Education Committee
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-20SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback