TN SB0253 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, phases out the professional privilege tax over a four-year period for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As introduced, phases out the professional privilege tax over a four-year period for tax years that begin on and after June 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0246 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019