TN SB0253 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds as an advisory enhancement factor to sentencing that defendant intentionally chose victim of crime based on gender identity or expression. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-114.
Title
As introduced, adds as an advisory enhancement factor to sentencing that defendant intentionally chose victim of crime based on gender identity or expression. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-114.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0335 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0253&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0253.pdf |