TN SB0248 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a deaf mentor program to be carried out by the West Tennessee School for the Deaf in Jackson and the Tennessee School for the Deaf in Nashville and Knoxville. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 10, Part 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 10, Part 9, relative to deaf mentor programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0631 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee