TN SB0244 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at the Historic Jackson Theater, the Jonesborough Repertory Theatre, the International Storytelling Center, the McKinney Center, and the Jonesborough Visitor Center, all located in Jonesborough.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-4-102, relative to consumption of alcoholic beverages on premises.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 388 | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0201 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021