TN SB0244 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 862
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires, in cases where an ultrasound is performed as part of an examination prior to an abortion, the person who performs the ultrasound to offer the woman the opportunity to learn the results of the ultrasound; requires, if ultrasound is performed, that report of abortion indicate whether or not a heartbeat was detected. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires, in cases where an ultrasound is performed as part of an examination prior to an abortion, the person who performs the ultrasound to offer the woman the opportunity to learn the results of the ultrasound; requires, if ultrasound is performed, that report of abortion indicate whether or not a heartbeat was detected. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 862
2018-04-19SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-18SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/18/18
2018-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
2018-02-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-15SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0108 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 862

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback