TN SB0244 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the office of business enterprise, June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 26 and Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the office of business enterprise, June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 26 and Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-01 Pub. Ch. 1
2015-04-01 Effective date(s) 03/17/2015
2015-03-17SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-03-11SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-03-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-03-11SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-03-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-03-09HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-03-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-03-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-03-02SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2015-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/2/2015
2015-02-25SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/25/2015
2015-02-18SenateAction deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 2/25/2015
2015-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/18/2015
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0380 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback