TN SB0244 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pub. Ch. 312
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits recipients of public assistance from using electronic benefit transfer cards to purchase certain goods or services in certain establishments. - Amends TCA Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits recipients of public assistance from using electronic benefit transfer cards to purchase certain goods or services in certain establishments. - Amends TCA Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07HousePub. Ch. 312
2013-05-07HouseEffective date(s) 04/29/2013; 07/01/2014
2013-04-29HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-18HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-17HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-16HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-15HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 2
2013-04-15HouseAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0139)
2013-04-15HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-02-28SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-02-25SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-02-25SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
2013-02-25SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0022)
2013-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/25/2013
2013-02-20SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-02-13SenatePlaced on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/20/2013
2013-02-13SenateAction Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 2/20/2013
2013-02-06SenatePlaced on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/13/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-29SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0119 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 312

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback