TN SB0244 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Labor & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, beginning July 1, 2013, prohibits manufacture, sale, offer for sale or distribution in Tennessee of children's products that contain cadmium at more than .004 percent by weight. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, beginning July 1, 2013, prohibits manufacture, sale, offer for sale or distribution in Tennessee of children's products that contain cadmium at more than .004 percent by weight. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-09 P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
2011-02-07 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-27 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0189 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-05 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Conservation Subcommittee of Conservation & Environment Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback