TN SB0244 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, eliminates the putative father registry. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, eliminates the putative father registry. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-06 Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
2009-05-06 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009
2009-05-05 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009
2009-05-01 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-05 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0362 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback