TN SB0243 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, recognizes the Algonquian, the Chickamaugan, the Iroquoian, the Muskogean, the Siouan, and the Yuchean cultural groups as Tennessee's first peoples. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 4, relative to Tennessee's first peoples.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0355 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - P2C, ref. to Naming & Designating

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback