TN SB0243 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner to report the death of any person in custody to members of the general assembly representing the legislative districts where the deceased person resided at the time of death within five, rather than 10, business days of death. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, requires commissioner to report the death of any person in custody to members of the general assembly representing the legislative districts where the deceased person resided at the time of death within five, rather than 10, business days of death. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1247 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-17 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee