TN SB0243 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires judgment debtors who are being garnisheed at work to notify judgment creditors when they change employment.
Title
As enacted, requires judgment debtors who are being garnisheed at work to notify judgment creditors when they change employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Pub. Ch. 187 |
2013-04-29 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-10 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-08 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 1 |
2013-04-04 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2013-04-03 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0235) |
2013-04-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 23, Nays 4, PNV 1 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0060) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0232) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/11/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0548 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 187