TN SB0242 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the time period the general assembly has to confirm an appointment to the commission from 30 days to 90 days. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 1 and Title 65, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 65, Chapter 1 and Title 65, Chapter 2, relative to the Tennessee public utility commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1044 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback