TN SB0242 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires public postsecondary institutions to classify the spouse or dependent child of an active member of the United States armed forces transferred out of state on military orders as an in-state student for tuition purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, requires public postsecondary institutions to classify the spouse or dependent child of an active member of the United States armed forces transferred out of state on military orders as an in-state student for tuition purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 80 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 04/03/2019 | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/13/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0205 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 80