TN SB0230 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the present law provisions governing the apportionment of gasoline tax revenue to the wildlife resources fund. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, revises the present law provisions governing the apportionment of gasoline tax revenue to the wildlife resources fund. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 3, Part 9.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 478 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0910 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 478