TN SB0229 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the commission to establish a four-year pilot program to award completion grants to Tennessee Promise scholarship students who have an immediate financial need or who are experiencing a financial hardship that may prevent the student from completing a postsecondary degree or credential. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to completion grants for Tennessee Promise scholarship students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 512
2021-05-04SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/4/2021
2021-05-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/4/2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-02-24SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/24/2021
2021-02-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/17/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0006 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 512

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback