TN SB0228 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends, from 60 days to 12 months, the period of postpartum coverage for pregnant women who meet certain medical assistance eligibility requirements in accordance with provisions of the American Rescue Plan. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 71, relative to Medicaid postpartum coverage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0360 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback