TN SB0226 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Good Samaritan Sentencing Enhancement Act," which provides that a defendant convicted of first degree murder is eligible for the death penalty if the victim was rendering assistance to a person in need at the time of their death. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to criminal sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 215
2021-04-08SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021
2021-03-30SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0047 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 215

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback