TN SB0225 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the date by which a student must have attained the age of five for purposes of enrolling in kindergarten. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to kindergarten.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0056 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-27 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee