TN SB0220 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands the category of independent students eligible for a Tennessee reconnect grant to include students who are not eligible to be claimed as a dependent for federal tax purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, expands the category of independent students eligible for a Tennessee reconnect grant to include students who are not eligible to be claimed as a dependent for federal tax purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0719 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback