TN SB0217 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes beer manufacturers to self-distribute beer within a 100-mile radius of the manufacturer if the manufacturer brews 50,000 gallons or less. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes beer manufacturers to self-distribute beer within a 100-mile radius of the manufacturer if the manufacturer brews 50,000 gallons or less. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateFailed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1081 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback