TN SB0216 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the soil scientist advisory committee, June 30, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 62, Chapter 18, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the soil scientist advisory committee, June 30, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 62, Chapter 18, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-16 Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
2011-02-09 Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. 1 cal. for 2/16/2011
2011-02-09 P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
2011-02-07 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-25 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0663 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-16 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback