TN SB0214 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2017." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 854 of the Public Acts of 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Annual Coverage Assessment Act of 2017." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5 and Chapter 854 of the Public Acts of 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 364
2017-05-03SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-03SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-04-25SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2017
2017-04-24SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4-25-17
2017-04-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0647 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 364

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback