TN SB0214 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 539
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, "SPC Raymond Neal Mitchell III Memorial Bridge," Interstate 24 and State Route 266 (Sam Ridley Parkway) in Town of Smyrna.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, "SPC Raymond Neal Mitchell III Memorial Bridge," Interstate 24 and State Route 266 (Sam Ridley Parkway) in Town of Smyrna.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-15 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-07 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 539
2009-06-16 Comp. HB subst.
2009-06-16 Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 06/16/2009
2009-06-15 Rec. for pass. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
2009-06-15 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/15/2009
2009-06-12 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/12/2009
2009-06-11 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/12/2009
2009-06-11 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/11/2009
2009-06-10 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009
2009-06-09 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/10/2009
2009-06-04 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009
2009-06-03 Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal.
2009-06-02 Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm to 6/3/09
2009-05-28 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2009
2009-03-03 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. F,W&M Comm.
2009-02-25 Placed on Senate Transportation Consent cal. for 03/03/2009
2009-02-18 Placed on Senate Transportation Consent cal. for 02/24/2009
2009-02-17 Action def. in S. Trans. Comm. to 2/24/09
2009-02-12 Placed on Senate Transportation Consent cal. for 02/17/2009
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-05 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0509 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 539

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback