TN SB0213 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a person convicted of domestic assault involving strangulation to serve a mandatory minimum sentence of 30 days incarceration; enhances offenses involving strangulation or attempted strangulation based on certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal offenses against persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24 Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
2023-05-24 Pub. Ch. 440
2023-05-17SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-05-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-28SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-21HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0
2023-04-21HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0369)
2023-04-21HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-04-06HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-04-03SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-03SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1
2023-04-03SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0195)
2023-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/3/2023
2023-03-21SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023
2023-02-07SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/14/2023
2023-02-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/7/2023
2023-01-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0248 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 440

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback