TN SB0213 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from October 1 to September 15, the date by which the commissioner shall notify any school and its respective LEA if the school is among the bottom 10 percent of schools in overall achievement. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, changes from October 1 to September 15, the date by which the commissioner shall notify any school and its respective LEA if the school is among the bottom 10 percent of schools in overall achievement. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0240 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education Committee