TN SB0212 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Hearing: Mar 3 @ 1:00 pm in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires licensing authority, upon learning a healthcare prescriber was indicted for or convicted of certain criminal offenses, to restrict or revoke, respectively, the prescriber’s ability to prescribe controlled substances; requires licensing authority to suspend the license of certain healthcare professionals upon finding the healthcare professional failed to comply with physician collaboration requirements; requires facility administrators to report certain information. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29, Chapter 26; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29, Chapter 26; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to health-related licensing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1045 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback