TN SB0210 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires commissioner of health to report to the speakers and the health committees the impact of recent legislation reducing the abuse of opioids in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to substance abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1033 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback