TN SB0209 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the fish and wildlife commission to promulgate rules to create quiet zones on waterways to prohibit disturbance of adjacent residences from 9:00 p.m. to 9:00 a.m. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70, relative to noise levels.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0203 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback