TN SB0207 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Stopping Addiction and Fostering Excellence (SAFE) Act." - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 33; Title 47; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6; Title 33; Title 47; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to alcohol and drug services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0215 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-03 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback